+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 922
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to next calendar
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/12/2014
- Action Def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/12/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/5/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/25/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 8, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
April 7, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
February 25, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor