+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1093
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/9/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- No Action Taken
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/2/2022
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/22/2022
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction