+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Def. to Summer Study of Tennessee Council on Aging and Disabilities
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
K. Brooks
Type:
Primary Sponsor