+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 913
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2022
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/6/2022
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/29/2022
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- No Action Taken
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/22/2022
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/22/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/15/2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/15/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/8/2022
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of K-12 Subcommittee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/8/2022
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 5, 2022: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 29, 2022: K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor