+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 768
- Effective date(s) 04/19/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0891)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0914)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/20/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 4, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 26, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
March 26, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 20, 2018: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 20, 2018: HOUSE EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 14, 2018: HOUSE EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
March 14, 2018: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor