+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/16/2022
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor