+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 73
- Effective date(s) 04/02/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/11/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/26/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/20/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
February 26, 2013: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
February 20, 2013: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor