+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Re-ref. Local Committee
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on cal. for 3/12/2020
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/27/2020
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2020
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Committee for 2/12/2020
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/5/2020
- Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Committee
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 12, 2020: HOUSE LOCAL COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 5, 2020: HOUSE ELECTIONS & CAMPAIGN FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor