+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 03/18/2022
- Pub. Ch. 671
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 5
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0503)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0513)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 76, Nays 15, PNV 3
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/28/2022
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/24/2022
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/16/2022
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/9/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 2/9/2022
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/2/2022
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 3
February 16, 2022: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 9, 2022: HOUSE CHILDREN & FAMILY AFFAIRS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor