+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 876
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 3
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/21/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2018
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (12)
April 17, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
April 2, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
April 2, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 27, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 27, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 21, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 21, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 21, 2018: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 21, 2018: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 13, 2018: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
February 13, 2018: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor