+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 712
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/4/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0997
Amendment 1-0 to HB1857
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 25, 2014: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor