+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 05/25/2022
- Pub. Ch. 1057
On May 25, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2022
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2022
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/12/2022
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2022
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/9/2022
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (7)
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 18, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 12, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 6, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 15, 2022: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 9, 2022: HOUSE PUBLIC SERVICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor