+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to last calendar
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.