+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 22, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 806
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on cal. for 6/11/2020
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/2/2020
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/10/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction