+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 968
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to last calendar
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/25/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA1117
Amendment 1-0 to HB1846
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 1, 2014: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
March 25, 2014: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor