+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 602
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/25/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Action def. in State Committee to 2/25/2020
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/18/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/11/2020
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Committee
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction