+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 632
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2018
- Reset on next avail. cal.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Move to Heel
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/27/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 2/21/2018
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/7/2018
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 12, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 27, 2018: HOUSE INSURANCE AND BANKING: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 27, 2018: INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 21, 2018: HOUSE INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
February 21, 2018: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor