+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 631
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/6/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/20/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (10)
March 12, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 12, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 6, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 6, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 28, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 28, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 20, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 20, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 14, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
February 14, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor