+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 630
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/6/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.