+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor