+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 719
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/3/20
- Reset on next avail. cal.
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/9/2020
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/9/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/2/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/25/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Action def. in State Committee to 2/25/2020
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/18/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/11/2020
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 9, 2020: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 25, 2020: HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
February 11, 2020: HOUSE DEPARTMENTS & AGENCIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor