+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 383
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reset on cal. for 4/20/15
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 12, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/14/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/7/2015
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.