+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 05/03/2018
- Pub. Ch. 854
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 90, Nays 1 PNV 1 HB1807
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/23/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0821)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 1
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/2/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2018
- Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/14/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/7/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/27/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (13)
April 23, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 89
April 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89