+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 673
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/8/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 2/23/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 2/23/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 2/16/2016
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/9/2016
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2/9/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/2/2016
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.