+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor