+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/17/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 2/17/2016
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/10/2016
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs--Education Administration
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.