+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 872
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1043)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1210)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1054)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/27/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
April 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8