+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 594
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/10/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/26/2014
- Action Def. in Health Committee to 2/26/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/19/2014
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/11/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- Sponsor change.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.