+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 183
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/2/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Transportation Committee to 4/2/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0285
Amendment 1-0 to HB0178
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 2, 2013: TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE
March 20, 2013: TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor