+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/13/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/7/2018
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 13, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 7, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
February 7, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor