+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Education
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
- No Action Taken
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
- No Action Taken
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/13/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in Education to 3/13/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 2/20/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 2/12/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
February 12, 2019: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
+ − Sponsor
Love
Type:
Primary Sponsor