+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 908
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2014
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
- Passed S., Ayes 26, Nays 4
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 64, Nays 22, PNV 2
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1240)
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1198)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/8/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/1/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/18/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/12/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/5/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/5/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
April 15, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 36
April 8, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 8, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor