+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/24/2022
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/17/2022
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/9/2022
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/1/2022
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
February 9, 2022: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 1, 2022: HOUSE HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor