+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 740
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/11/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 18, 2014: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
March 11, 2014: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor