+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor