+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/4/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in State Government Committee to 3/4/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/25/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in State Government Committee to 2/25/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/18/2014
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in State Government Committee to 2/18/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/11/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/5/2014
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
February 5, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor