+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/9/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor