+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 613
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/9/2020
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 16, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
March 13, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar
March 9, 2020: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor