+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor