+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/22/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2016
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.