+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1033
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2016
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2016
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/19/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2016
- Action def. in Health Committee to 3/23/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/16/2016
- Action def. in Health Committee to 3/16/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/9/2016
- Action def. in Health Committee to 3/9/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/2/2016
- Action def. in Health Committee to 3/2/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/24/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/16/2016
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/16/2016
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/9/2016
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Government Operations for review
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.