+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Transportation Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Transportation Committee to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Transportation Committee to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/11/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/5/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 5, 2014: TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor