+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Failed for Lack of Second in: State Government Subcommittee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/5/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.