+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Failed In s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/12/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 12, 2014: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor