+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee--Government Operations for review
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor