+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Business and Utilities Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/26/2014
- Action Def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 3/26/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/19/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/11/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 11, 2014: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor