+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 826
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2016
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/29/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/16/2016
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/9/2016
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
- Yeas: 4
March 29, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 4
March 23, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 4
March 16, 2016: CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 4
March 9, 2016: CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor