+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/18/2014
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/18/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/11/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.