+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 670
- Effective date(s) 04/14/2014
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 2
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on S. Regular Calendar for 3/31/14
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 65, Nays 24, PNV 3
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/27/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/18/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/4/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (7)
March 31, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
March 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
March 20, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 18, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE
February 26, 2014: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor