+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 757
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/8/2022
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/2/2022
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/22/2022
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/16/2022
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction